Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Property and Casualty Insurance - Vessel Liability Coverage - Required
Sponsored by
Delegate Barkley
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing vessel liability insurance in the State; providing for the types of basic and additional coverage under a policy of vessel liability insurance; requiring specified minimum security for specified vessels that are principally operated in the waters of the State; providing for the required form and benefits under the security; authorizing the Department of Natural Resources to accept specified forms of security; providing that a violation of specified provisions of the Act is a misdemeanor; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0763
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/07/2013
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/07/2013
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2013
Legislative Date
3/12/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2013 2/07/2013 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/07/2013 2/07/2013 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/11/2013 3/12/2013 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   19-1001 through 19-1018, 27-609.1 )
(   8-701, 8-739, 8-745 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM