Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Deaths Involving a Law Enforcement Officer - Reports
Sponsored by
Delegates A. Washington, Morales, Anderson, D. Barnes, Carter, Conaway, Patterson, Smith, and Sydnor
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 134
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring local law enforcement agencies to provide the Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention with information on officer-involved deaths and deaths in the line of duty; requiring the Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention to report annually information on officer-involved deaths and deaths in the line of duty to the General Assembly on or before June 30 and to report on or before October 15, 2016, on the number of officer-involved deaths and deaths in the line of duty in the last 3 calendar years; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {302310/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (98-42)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2015
Legislative Date
3/24/2015
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/11/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {878375/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Ramirez) {763029/1 Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (112-26)
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
70
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 134
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/13/2015 2/13/2015 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/19/2015 3/19/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/20/2015 3/18/2015 Favorable with Amendments {302310/1 Report Adopted 48
House 3/20/2015 3/18/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
House 3/23/2015 3/20/2015 Third Reading Passed (98-42) 50
Senate 3/23/2015 3/20/2015 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 47A
Senate 3/24/2015 3/24/2015 Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/10/2015 4/11/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 Favorable with Amendments {878375/1 Report Adopted 62
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 Floor Amendment (Senator Ramirez) {763029/1 Adopted 62
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62
Senate 4/13/2015 4/05/2015 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) 63
House 4/13/2015 4/09/2015 House Concur - Senate Amendments 70
House 4/13/2015 4/09/2015 Third Reading Passed (112-26) 70
House 4/13/2015 4/09/2015 Passed Enrolled 70
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 134
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM