Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Crimes - Use of Personal Identifying Information or the Identity of Another - Sexual Crimes
Sponsored by
Delegates Dumais, Clippinger, Fraser-Hidalgo, Lee, Simmons, Valderrama, and Waldstreicher
Status
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from using specified identifying information or the identity of an individual without consent to invite, encourage, or solicit another to commit a sexual crime against the individual; establishing penalties; authorizing a State's Attorney or the Attorney General to investigate and prosecute a violation of the Act; providing that when the Attorney General exercises the authority to investigate and prosecute a violation of the Act, the Attorney General has specified powers and duties; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0050
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/06/2014
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/15/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2014
Legislative Date
5/15/2014
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2014 2/06/2014 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/07/2014 2/07/2014 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/14/2014 3/15/2014 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/15/2014 3/12/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 48
House 3/15/2014 3/12/2014 Second Reading Passed 48
House 3/17/2014 3/13/2014 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 49
Senate 3/18/2014 3/13/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 47
Senate 3/28/2014 4/01/2014 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/02/2014 3/24/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 58
Senate 4/02/2014 3/24/2014 Second Reading Passed 58
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 60
House 4/05/2014 3/29/2014 Returned Passed 65
Post Passage 5/15/2014 5/15/2014 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-325 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM