Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Housing - Accessible Housing for Senior Homeowners, Older Adults, and Individuals with Disabilities
Sponsored by
Delegates Rosenberg, Carr, Healey, and Glenn
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 657
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Accessible Homes for Senior Homeowners Grant Program; authorizing the Department of Housing and Community Development to make grants to families of limited income under the Maryland Housing Rehabilitation Program under specified circumstances; authorizing the Department of Housing and Community Development to make grants to finance specified activities for elderly homeowners; authorizing the Department to establish standards to determine eligibility for the grant program; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/07/2013
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/07/2013
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/17/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {530017/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/17/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/25/2013
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {164737/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2013
Legislative Date
5/16/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 657
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2013 2/07/2013 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 2/07/2013 2/07/2013 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/18/2013 3/19/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
House 3/20/2013 3/17/2013 Favorable with Amendments {530017/1 Report Adopted 50
House 3/20/2013 3/17/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 50
House 3/21/2013 3/18/2013 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 51
Senate 3/22/2013 3/20/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 51
Senate 3/25/2013 3/25/2013 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/01/2013 4/02/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/02/2013 3/28/2013 Favorable with Amendments {164737/1 Report Adopted 59
Senate 4/02/2013 3/28/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59
Senate 4/03/2013 3/29/2013 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) 60
House 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 House Concur - Senate Amendments 63
House 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 63
House 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Passed Enrolled 63
Post Passage 5/16/2013 5/16/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 657
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-505, 4-901, 4-905, 4-916, 4-917, 4-923, 4-931 )
(   10-206 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM