Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Impaired Driving - Repeat Offenders - Penalties
Sponsored by
Delegates Valentino-Smith, Clippinger, DeBoy, Frank, Hubbard, Kaiser, A. Kelly, McMillan, Niemann, B. Robinson, Stocksdale, Swain, and Valderrama
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 244
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the penalty for a third or subsequent violation of specified prohibitions against driving while impaired by alcohol or drugs; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0710
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/06/2014
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/06/2014
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {832618/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Special Order until 4/3 (Senator Ramirez) Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Special Order until 4/4 (Senator Simonaire) Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Simonaire) {673520/1 Rejected (8-37)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/14/2014
Legislative Date
4/14/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 244
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2014 2/06/2014 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/06/2014 2/06/2014 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/12/2014 3/13/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/13/2014 3/10/2014 Favorable with Amendments {832618/1 Report Adopted 46
House 3/13/2014 3/10/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46
House 3/14/2014 3/11/2014 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 47
Senate 3/18/2014 3/13/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 47
Senate 3/31/2014 4/01/2014 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/02/2014 3/24/2014 Favorable 58
Senate 4/02/2014 3/24/2014 Special Order until 4/3 (Senator Ramirez) Adopted 58
Senate 4/03/2014 3/25/2014 Favorable 59
Senate 4/03/2014 3/25/2014 Special Order until 4/4 (Senator Simonaire) Adopted 59
Senate 4/05/2014 3/27/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 61
Senate 4/05/2014 3/27/2014 Floor Amendment (Senator Simonaire) {673520/1 Rejected (8-37) 61
Senate 4/05/2014 3/27/2014 Second Reading Passed 61
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 62
House 4/07/2014 4/01/2014 Returned Passed 68
Post Passage 4/14/2014 4/14/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 244
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-902, 27-101 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM