Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Workers' Compensation - Occupational Disease Presumption - Duty Belt Worn by Law Enforcement
Sponsored by
Delegates Folden and Cluster
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that specified paid police officers and paid deputy sheriffs are presumed to be suffering from an occupational disease for a lower-back impairment under the workers' compensation law under specified circumstances; providing that the presumption shall apply only if the police officers and deputy sheriffs subject to the Act have been employed for a specified period of time and were required, as a condition of employment, to wear a specified duty belt; requiring that the presumption extends for a specified period of time; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0416 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2015
Legislative Date
2/27/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2015
Legislative Date
2/27/2015
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2015
Legislative Date
2/27/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2015
Legislative Date
2/27/2015
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2015
Legislative Date
3/10/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2015
Legislative Date
3/13/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/13/2015 2/13/2015 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/27/2015 2/27/2015 Hearing cancelled
House 2/27/2015 2/27/2015 Hearing 3/06 at 1:30 p.m.
House 2/27/2015 2/27/2015 Hearing cancelled
House 2/27/2015 2/27/2015 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/10/2015 3/10/2015 Hearing cancelled
House 3/12/2015 3/13/2015 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM