Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Governmental Procedures - Security and Protection of Information
Sponsored by
Delegate Lee (Commission on Maryland Cybersecurity Innovation and Excellence) and Delegates Bobo, Cullison, DeBoy, Dumais, Eckardt, Healey, Hough, McDonough, A. Miller, Mizeur, Pendergrass, B. Robinson, S. Robinson, Stocksdale, F. Turner, and Valderrama
Status
In the Senate - Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring State and local government units, when destroying an individual's records that contain specified personal information of the individual, to take specified steps to protect against the unauthorized acquisition or use of the personal information under specified circumstances; requiring a government unit that collects, maintains, or makes available specified personal information of an individual to implement and maintain specified security procedures and practices under specified circumstances; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0676
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/07/2013
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {916887/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/08/2013
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/08/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2013 2/07/2013 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/08/2013 2/08/2013 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/04/2013 4/05/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/06/2013 4/01/2013 Favorable with Amendments {916887/1 Report Adopted 65
House 4/06/2013 4/01/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 65
House 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 66
Senate 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 First Reading Senate Rules 65
Senate 4/08/2013 4/08/2013 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/08/2013 4/08/2013 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-1301 through 10-1308 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM