Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Physicians - Qualifications for Licensure and Definitions
Sponsored by
Delegates A. Kelly, Costa, Cullison, Donoghue, Hubbard, Kach, Kipke, Love, Morhaim, Nathan-Pulliam, Pena-Melnyk, and V. Turner
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 626
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Clarifying that specified applicants who have failed a specified examination a specified number of times or more must pass the examination, be otherwise qualified, and satisfy specified other requirements to qualify for a license to practice medicine; and altering the definition of "board certified".
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/06/2014
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/12/2014
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/03/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/05/2014
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/15/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2014
Legislative Date
3/19/2014
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2014
Legislative Date
5/15/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 626
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2014 2/06/2014 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/12/2014 2/12/2014 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/03/2014 3/03/2014 Hearing cancelled
House 3/05/2014 3/05/2014 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/14/2014 3/15/2014 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/15/2014 3/12/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 48A
House 3/15/2014 3/12/2014 Second Reading Passed 48A
House 3/17/2014 3/13/2014 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 49
Senate 3/18/2014 3/13/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 47
Senate 3/19/2014 3/19/2014 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/31/2014 4/01/2014 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/02/2014 3/24/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 58
Senate 4/02/2014 3/24/2014 Second Reading Passed 58
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 60
House 4/05/2014 3/29/2014 Returned Passed 65
Post Passage 5/15/2014 5/15/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 626
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-101, 14-307 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM