Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Personal Information Protection Act - Revisions
Sponsored by
Delegate Lee (Commission on Maryland Cybersecurity Innovation and Excellence) and Delegates Conaway, DeBoy, Dumais, Glenn, Hough, Kaiser, and B. Robinson
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a specified business, when destroying a customer's records that contain specified personal or private information, to take specified steps to protect against unauthorized access to or use of the information; requiring a specified business that owns or licenses specified personal or private information of an individual residing in the State to implement and maintain specified security procedures and practices; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0859
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/07/2013
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2013 2/07/2013 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/08/2013 2/08/2013 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/20/2013 3/21/2013 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-3501 through 14-3504, 14-3505, 14-3506, 14-3507, 14-3508 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM