Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Residency Requirement MC 22-14
Sponsored by
Montgomery County Delegation
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing that in Montgomery County provisions of law requiring that an applicant for an alcoholic beverages license or a partner in a partnership for which an application for an alcoholic beverages license is made have residency in the County for 2 years before the application is filed may be satisfied by residency in the State, the District of Columbia, or in Northern Virginia; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1025
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/06/2014
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/14/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {543197/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (104-29)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
47
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2014 2/06/2014 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/07/2014 2/07/2014 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/13/2014 3/14/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/14/2014 3/11/2014 Favorable with Amendments {543197/1 Report Adopted 47
House 3/14/2014 3/11/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
House 3/15/2014 3/12/2014 Third Reading Passed (104-29) 48
Senate 3/18/2014 3/13/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 47
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-103, 9-101 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM