Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Rural Broadband Communication Services
Sponsored by
Delegates Mautz, Anderton, Aumann, Buckel, Impallaria, Jameson, Lisanti, Malone, McComas, Morgan, Reilly, Rose, and Szeliga
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 176
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Continuing the Maryland Rural Broadband Coordination Board and the Rural Broadband Assistance Fund; expanding the places where certain nonprofit telecommunications services providers are authorized to install broadband communication infrastructure without incurring a fee for the use of an easement; requiring the Department of Housing and Community Development to complete an inventory of State and local government assets that can be used to assist with the expansion of services to unserved and underserved areas of the State; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2018
Legislative Date
2/06/2018
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {143595/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
48B
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {447172/1 Adopted
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Rural Broadband Communication Services
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/24/2018
Legislative Date
4/24/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 176
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Rural Broadband Communication Services
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Department of Information Technology - Rural Broadband Service - Inventory and Mapping of Assets
House 2/06/2018 2/06/2018 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/16/2018 3/13/2018 Favorable with Amendments {143595/1 Adopted 47
House 3/16/2018 3/13/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
Text - Third - Department of Housing and Community Development – Rural Broadband Service – Inventory and Mapping of Assets
House 3/19/2018 3/15/2018 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 49
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Finance 48B
Senate 3/21/2018 3/21/2018 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 4/05/2018 4/05/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Favorable with Amendments {447172/1 Adopted 62A
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62A
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 63
House 4/07/2018 3/30/2018 House Concurs Senate Amendments 64
House 4/07/2018 3/30/2018 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 64
House 4/07/2018 3/30/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Rural Broadband Communication Services
Post Passage 4/24/2018 4/24/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 176
Text - Chapter - Rural Broadband Communication Services
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2006, 2008 )
Last Updated: 1/19/2020 9:32 AM