Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Correctional Facilities - Correctional Officers - Polygraph Examination
Sponsored by
Delegates Hough, Arora, Boteler, Cluster, Costa, DeBoy, Fraser-Hidalgo, Holmes, Kipke, Kramer, McConkey, McDermott, W. Miller, and Simmons
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Secretary of Public Safety and Correctional Services to require an individual to pass a polygraph examination before being appointed to serve as a correctional officer in a correctional facility; and requiring the Secretary to adopt regulations governing the administration of the polygraph examination required by the Act.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/06/2014
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2014
Legislative Date
3/19/2014
Action
Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2014 2/06/2014 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/07/2014 2/07/2014 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/12/2014 3/13/2014 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/13/2014 3/10/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 46
House 3/13/2014 3/10/2014 Second Reading Passed 46
House 3/14/2014 3/11/2014 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 47
Senate 3/18/2014 3/13/2014 First Reading Finance 47
Senate 3/19/2014 3/19/2014 Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/25/2014 3/25/2014 Hearing cancelled
Senate 3/25/2014 3/25/2014 Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM