Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Auxiliary Winery Permit
Sponsored by
Delegates Mautz, Adams, Anderton, Barkley, Carey, Carr, Fisher, Frick, Krebs, Lafferty, Lisanti, Luedtke, Otto, Stein, and West
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing an auxiliary winery permit; authorizing the Comptroller to issue the permit to a holder of a Class 4 limited winery permit for use at a single location off the licensed premises anywhere in the State subject to certain restrictions; authorizing the Comptroller to issue up to 25 permits throughout the State; limiting each license holder to no more than one permit; providing an annual permit fee of $250; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0283
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1024 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Alcoholic Beverages - Auxiliary Winery Permit
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2018
Legislative Date
2/06/2018
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Alcoholic Beverages - Auxiliary Winery Permit
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-2)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
48B
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Alcoholic Beverages - Auxiliary Winery Permit
House 2/06/2018 2/06/2018 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/17/2018 3/17/2018 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/17/2018 3/13/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 47A
Text - Third - Alcoholic Beverages - Auxiliary Winery Permit
House 3/19/2018 3/14/2018 Third Reading Passed (135-2) 48
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 48B
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM