Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Edward T. Conroy and Jean B. Cryor Memorial Scholarship Programs
Sponsored by
Delegates Cullison, Barkley, Barve, Bromwell, Clippinger, DeBoy, Donoghue, Gutierrez, Hucker, Ivey, Kaiser, A. Kelly, Kipke, Krebs, Lafferty, Luedtke, McDermott, McIntosh, Olszewski, Reznik, F. Turner, Waldstreicher, M. Washington, and Zucker
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 395
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Jean B. Cryor Memorial Scholarship Program to provide scholarships for the son or daughter or the surviving spouse of a school employee who died in the line of duty or who sustained an injury in the line of duty that rendered the school employee 100% disabled; authorizing the use of the scholarship for specified educational expenses; requiring specified postsecondary institutions to determine eligibility for the scholarships; requiring a specified report; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/07/2013
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2013
Legislative Date
3/11/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2013
Legislative Date
3/11/2013
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2013
Legislative Date
3/25/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {305564/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/22/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2013
Legislative Date
3/26/2013
Action
Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {104237/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/02/2013
Legislative Date
5/02/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 395
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2013 2/07/2013 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/13/2013 2/13/2013 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/11/2013 3/11/2013 Hearing cancelled
House 3/11/2013 3/11/2013 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/23/2013 3/25/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 Favorable with Amendments {305564/1 Report Adopted 54
House 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 54
House 3/25/2013 3/22/2013 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 55
Senate 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 52
Senate 3/26/2013 3/26/2013 Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/04/2013 4/05/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/05/2013 4/01/2013 Favorable with Amendments {104237/1 Report Adopted 63
Senate 4/05/2013 4/01/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 63
Senate 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) 64
House 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 House Concur - Senate Amendments 67
House 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 67
House 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Passed Enrolled 67
Post Passage 5/02/2013 5/02/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 395
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   18-601 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM