Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Correctional Services - Eligibility for Parole - Violent Crime
Sponsored by
Delegates Malone, Afzali, Arentz, Buckel, Cassilly, Corderman, Folden, Glass, Grammer, Kipke, Krebs, McComas, McConkey, Miele, W. Miller, Parrott, Rose, Shoemaker, Szeliga, and Vogt
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a certain inmate who has been convicted of a certain violent crime committed on or after October 1, 2018, from being eligible for parole until the inmate has served a certain portion of a certain sentence under certain circumstances; requiring a certain inmate who has been convicted of a certain violent crime committed on or after October 1, 2018, to receive an administrative review of the inmate's progress in the correctional facility after the inmate has served a certain part of a certain sentence; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Correctional Services - Eligibility for Parole - Violent Crime
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2018
Legislative Date
2/06/2018
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Correctional Services - Eligibility for Parole - Violent Crime
House 2/06/2018 2/06/2018 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM