Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Property and Casualty Insurance - Travel Insurance - Regulation
Sponsored by
Delegate Kramer
Status
In the House - Hearing canceled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Specifying that a specified insurer that offers or sells a travel insurance policy is required to pay a premium tax on specified premiums paid by specified persons; requiring travel insurance to be classified and filed as inland marine insurance; providing that eligibility and underwriting standards for travel insurance may be developed and provided based on specified travel protection plans; providing that travel insurance included as part of a travel protection plan may be offered in a specified manner; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0702
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2017
Legislative Date
2/06/2017
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2017
Legislative Date
2/06/2017
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Property and Casualty Insurance - Travel Insurance - Regulation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2017
Legislative Date
2/07/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2017
Legislative Date
2/07/2017
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2017
Legislative Date
2/22/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2017 2/06/2017 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/06/2017 2/06/2017 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Property and Casualty Insurance - Travel Insurance - Regulation
House 2/07/2017 2/07/2017 Hearing canceled
House 2/07/2017 2/07/2017 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/22/2017 2/22/2017 Hearing canceled
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-101, 1-101, 19-1001 through 19-1008 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM