Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws – Driving in Right–Hand Lanes – Interstate Highways in Rural Areas
Sponsored by
Delegate Parrott
Status
In the Senate - Special Order until 4/12 (Senator Beidle) Adopted
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the driver of a vehicle traveling slower than the general speed of traffic on interstate highways located in rural areas to drive the vehicle in the right-hand lanes; requiring the Motor Vehicle Administration to include certain information in the State's driver education curriculum; requiring the State Highway Administration to inform drivers of certain requirements by posting certain signage and providing certain notice; prohibiting the issuance of a citation for a violation of the Act; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/02/2021
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2021
Legislative Date
2/04/2021
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/22/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2021
Legislative Date
3/11/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {500112/1 Adopted
Proceedings
30AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2021
Legislative Date
3/11/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
30AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2021
Legislative Date
3/12/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (130-2)
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2021
Legislative Date
3/06/2021
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
4/02/2021
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2021
Legislative Date
4/07/2021
Action
Hearing 4/09 at 11:30 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
4/09/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Motion Special Order until 4/12 (Senator Beidle) Adopted
Proceedings
45AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/02/2021 2/02/2021 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Vehicle Laws – Driving in Right–Hand Lanes – Interstate Highways in Rural Areas
House 2/04/2021 2/04/2021 Hearing 2/18 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/22/2021 3/22/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/24/2021 3/11/2021 Favorable with Amendments {500112/1 Adopted 30AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/24/2021 3/11/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 30AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Vehicle Laws – Driving in Right–Hand Lanes – Interstate Highways in Rural Areas
House 3/25/2021 3/12/2021 Third Reading Passed (130-2) 31 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/26/2021 3/06/2021 Referred Rules 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2021 4/02/2021 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/07/2021 4/07/2021 Hearing 4/09 at 11:30 a.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2021 4/09/2021 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/09/2021 3/19/2021 Favorable Adopted 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2021 3/19/2021 Second Reading Passed 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2021 3/20/2021 Motion Special Order until 4/12 (Senator Beidle) Adopted 45AClick to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/10/2021 5:07 PM
Click to return on the top page