Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
The Hunger-Free Schools Act of 2015
Sponsored by
Delegates Haynes, Chang, Ebersole, Frush, Hettleman, Hill, Krimm, Lam, Lierman, McIntosh, A. Miller, Morhaim, Tarlau, and P. Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 291
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering a specified definition for fiscal years 2017 and 2018 to determine the number of students used to calculate the State compensatory education grant for schools that participate in the federal community eligibility provision for school meals; requiring the State Department of Education, the Department of Budget and Management, and the Department of Legislative Services to submit a specified report to specified committees of the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2015; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0334
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2015
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {625268/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/11/2015
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/13/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {629737/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-2)
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
70
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 291
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/01/2015 4/02/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/02/2015 3/29/2015 Favorable with Amendments {625268/1 Report Adopted 59
House 4/02/2015 3/29/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59
House 4/03/2015 3/30/2015 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 60
Senate 4/06/2015 3/30/2015 First Reading Senate Rules 57
Senate 4/11/2015 4/11/2015 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/13/2015 4/13/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/13/2015 4/05/2015 Favorable with Amendments {629737/1 Report Adopted 63
Senate 4/13/2015 4/05/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 63
Senate 4/13/2015 4/06/2015 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) 64
House 4/13/2015 4/09/2015 House Concur - Senate Amendments 70
House 4/13/2015 4/09/2015 Third Reading Passed (136-2) 70
House 4/13/2015 4/09/2015 Passed Enrolled 70
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 291
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-207 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM