Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force to Study Citations for Children and Law Enforcement Diversion Practices
Sponsored by
Delegate Anderson (By Request - Baltimore City Administration) and Delegate Carter
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force to Study Citations for Children and Law Enforcement Diversion Practices; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; prohibiting a member of the Task Force from receiving specified compensation, but authorizing the reimbursement of specified expenses; requiring the Task Force to study and make recommendations regarding specified matters; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0788
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/07/2013
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/07/2013
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2013 2/07/2013 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/07/2013 2/07/2013 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/19/2013 3/20/2013 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM