Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Community Colleges - Collective Bargaining
Sponsored by
Delegates Haynes, Morales, Angel, Barkley, B. Barnes, D. Barnes, Brooks, Campos, Carey, Carr, Clippinger, Cullison, Ebersole, Fennell, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frick, Gilchrist, Glenn, Gutierrez, Hayes, Healey, Hill, Hixson, C. Howard, Jalisi, Jones, Kelly, Korman, Kramer, Lafferty, Lam, Lierman, Luedtke, McCray, Moon, Patterson, Platt, Reznik, B. Robinson, S. Robinson, Rosenberg, Smith, Sophocleus, Tarlau, Valderrama, Waldstreicher, A. Washington, M. Washington, and Zucker
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing collective bargaining rights for specified community college employees; requiring specified community colleges to determine whether specified employees are public employees for purposes of collective bargaining; establishing procedures for the election or recognition of an exclusive bargaining representative; providing procedures by which the State Higher Education Labor Relations Board may designate a bargaining unit; establishing the maximum number of bargaining units within a community college; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0490 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Appropriations
House 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   16-403, 16-412, 16-414.1, 16-701 through 16-710 )
(   3-2A-01, 3-2A-05, 3-2A-07, 3-2A-08 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM