Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Legislative and Congressional Districting
Sponsored by
Delegates Hill, Krimm, Brooks, Carr, Lierman, Morales, and P. Young
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Creating the General Assembly Legislative Redistricting and Apportionment Commission; requiring the Commission to divide the State to create specified General Assembly districts; providing for the membership, qualifications, and duties of the Commission; specifying requirements for the adoption of redistricting plans; establishing the Commission to Study Congressional Districting; requiring the Commission to Study Congressional Districting to report its findings and recommendations on or before December 31, 2017; etc.
Committees
Details
Constitutional Bill
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017
Contingency - on a referendum
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2017
Legislative Date
2/06/2017
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Legislative and Congressional Districting
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2017 2/06/2017 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Legislative and Congressional Districting
House 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-7A-01 through 8-7A-14 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM