Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Motor Vehicles - Driver Education Program Curriculum - Police Traffic Stop Procedures
Sponsored by
Delegates Cassilly and Lisanti
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Motor Vehicle Administration to adopt regulations requiring that classroom instruction for the driver education program include instruction on what to do when stopped by a police officer.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0423
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2016 2/10/2016 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/16/2016 3/17/2016 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   16-505 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM