Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force to Study Privatization of the University of Maryland Medical System
Sponsored by
Delegates Miller, Arentz, Buckel, Chisholm, Clark, M. Fisher, Hornberger, Impallaria, Jacobs, Malone, Mangione, McComas, Metzgar, Morgan, Otto, Parrott, Rose, and Shoemaker
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Task force to Study Privatization of the University of Maryland Medical System; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; requiring the Task Force to study and make recommendations regarding certain matters; requiring the Task Force to report interim and final reports to the Governor and the General Assembly by December, 1, 2021 and July 1, 2022 respectively; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2020
Legislative Date
2/14/2020
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Task Force to Study Privatization of the University of Maryland Medical System
House 2/14/2020 2/14/2020 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/3/2020 10:49 AM