Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Landlord and Tenant - Commencement of Actions to Repossess
Sponsored by
Delegates Niemann and Frush
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that a landlord may file a written complaint to repossess for failure to pay rent no sooner than 3 days after the day unpaid rent is due and payable; altering the time after which a trial may be held in District Court from 5 to 10 days after the filing of a complaint for an action to repossess for failure to pay rent; altering the process by which a summons is served on a tenant in actions to repossess for failure to pay rent, holding over, and breach of lease; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/07/2013
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/07/2013
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2013
Legislative Date
3/11/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2013 2/07/2013 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 2/07/2013 2/07/2013 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/07/2013 3/11/2013 Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-401, 8-402, 8-402.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM