Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Children - Health and Safety - Child Abuse and Neglect Hotline and Signage
Sponsored by
Delegate Simonaire
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Social Services Administration of the Department of Human Resources to establish a specified hotline to make specified reports of suspected child abuse or neglect; requiring the Administration to develop a specified methodology to track specified numbers and types of calls to a specified hotline; requiring the Administration to create a specified sign that contains information regarding a reporting suspicion of child abuse, child neglect, or child sexual abuse; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2017
Legislative Date
2/06/2017
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2017
Legislative Date
2/09/2017
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2017 2/06/2017 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Children - Health and Safety - Child Abuse and Neglect Hotline and Signage
House 2/09/2017 2/09/2017 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-440 )
(   5-716 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM