Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
General Provisions - Cross-References and Corrections
Sponsored by
The Speaker (By Request - Department of Legislative Services - Code Revision)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 104
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Correcting specified cross-references to the General Provisions Article in the Annotated Code of Maryland; correcting specified errors relating to the General Provisions Article; and providing that specified powers of specified local governments shall be deemed to incorporate and include specified power and authority contained in specified provisions of the General Provisions Article.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/06/2014
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/12/2014
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/09/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/09/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2014
Legislative Date
3/17/2014
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/08/2014
Legislative Date
4/08/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 104
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2014 2/06/2014 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/12/2014 2/12/2014 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/07/2014 3/11/2014 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/12/2014 3/09/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 45
House 3/12/2014 3/09/2014 Second Reading Passed 45
House 3/13/2014 3/10/2014 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 46
Senate 3/14/2014 3/11/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 45
Senate 3/17/2014 3/17/2014 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/31/2014 3/31/2014 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/01/2014 3/23/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 57
Senate 4/01/2014 3/23/2014 Second Reading Passed 57
Senate 4/02/2014 3/24/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 58
House 4/03/2014 3/27/2014 Returned Passed 63
Post Passage 4/08/2014 4/08/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 104
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-112, 15-201, 15-205, 7-101 )
(   2-102, 2-503 )
(   12.5-303, 12-304, 17-1011 )
(   2-207, 2-309, 5-106, 5-110, 6-410, 8-105 )
(   3-708 )
(   10-407, 10-814, 11-408, 11-509 )
(   12-104, 12-113, 13-305, 14-104, 14-110, 14-404, 15-104, 24-207, 3-12A-05, 3-304, 3-3A-06, 3-5A-05, 3-5B-04, 3-704, 5-302 )
(   13-501 through 13-504, 3-204, 5-304 )
(   7-406, 7-702 )
(   2-402, 4-528, 4-706, 4-707, 5-203, 5-4B-06 )
(   11-620, 11-622, 12-408.1, 12-430.1, 12-922, 2-114, 2-117, 5-909, 8-307, 8-309 )
(   13-2003, 15-103, 15-147, 17-604, 20-108, 24-504, 4-217, 4-304, 5-708, 5-709 )
(   14-411, 19-205 )
(   12-309, 16-306, 9-304 )
(   10-465, 11-304 )
(   10-118, 11-603, 14-106, 14-133, 15-1902, 19-112, 19-211, 20-201, 2-209, 27-501, 27-802, 31-103, 31-104, 4-401, 4-405 )
(   10-104, 3-906 )
(   10-103, 20-103, 20-604, 29-108, 5-218, 9-405 )
(   15-104, 16-205 )
(   4-205, 8-1915, 8-704.1 )
(   12-101, 18-205, 19-101 )
(   14-126.1 )
(   10A-201, 10A-203, 10A-204, 11-201, 13-202, 13-223, 2-201, 5-703, 7-229, 7-230 )
(   10-117, 10-604, 10-605, 10-606, 10-607, 10-608, 10-631, 10-632, 10-633, 10-634, 10-637, 10-638, 10-639, 10-640, 10-641, 10-642, 10-903, 10-905, 18-114, 2-1224, 2-709, 9-20B-07 )
(   3-208, 3-2A-08, 3-501, 5-214, 5-310, 5-314 )
(   12-111, 12-112, 12-113, 12-302, 5-201.1, 6-201.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM