Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Real Property - New Home Sales - Information on Energy-Efficient Options
Sponsored by
Delegates Fraser-Hidalgo, Holmes, Reznik, and West
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring, for a development with 11 or more homes to be built by the same builder, a home builder to provide a purchaser with written information on energy-efficient options available for installation in a new home; and requiring a contract for the initial sale of a new home to contain a specified acknowledgment that the purchaser was provided with specified information about energy-efficient options for the home.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2017
Legislative Date
2/06/2017
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/12/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {150412/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/12/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (127-14)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/10/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2017 2/06/2017 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Real Property - New Home Sales - Information on Energy-Efficient Options
House 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/15/2017 3/12/2017 Favorable with Amendments {150412/1 Adopted 46
House 3/15/2017 3/12/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46
Text - Third - Real Property - New Home Sales - Information on Energy-Efficient Options
House 3/16/2017 3/13/2017 Third Reading Passed (127-14) 47
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Referred Judicial Proceedings 46
Senate 3/21/2017 3/21/2017 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/10/2017 4/10/2017 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-117 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM