Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Unpaid Assessments and Fees - Petition for Relief
Sponsored by
Delegates Niemann, Barnes, Braveboy, Dumais, Frush, Gaines, Healey, Lafferty, and V. Turner
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the governing body of a condominium or homeowners association to petition the District Court for relief if a unit owner or lot owner has failed to pay assessments and fees for 90 days or longer and is renting the unit or lot to a tenant; requiring a certified copy of the petition to be served on the unit owner or lot owner and the tenant in a specified manner; authorizing the District Court to enter an order directing the tenant to pay rent due under the lease to specified persons; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/06/2014
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/03/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2014 2/06/2014 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 2/07/2014 2/07/2014 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/03/2014 3/03/2014 Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-110.1, 11B-117.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM