Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Insurance - Transportation Network Insurance - Requirements and Coverage
Sponsored by
Delegate Kramer
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring a transportation network application company to disclose specified information in writing to its transportation network operators; requiring a transportation network application company and any transportation network operator to maintain specified transportation network insurance in accordance with the Act; providing for the application of transportation network insurance to specified activities of a transportation network operator during specified periods under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2015
Legislative Date
3/04/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2015
Legislative Date
3/13/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/13/2015 2/13/2015 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/04/2015 3/04/2015 Hearing cancelled
House 3/12/2015 3/13/2015 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   19-1001 through 19-1008 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM