Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Violations Involving Pedestrians or Bicyclists - Penalties (Pedestrian Safety Act of 2020)
Sponsored by
Delegates Stewart, Clark, Acevero, Attar, Boyce, Fraser-Hidalgo, Healey, Kerr, Korman, Lehman, Lierman, Lopez, Love, Moon, Palakovich Carr, Queen, Solomon, Stein, and Terrasa
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing certain minimum fines for certain traffic violations relating to the driver of a vehicle failing to stop or yield to certain pedestrian and bicycle traffic; altering the source of funds for the Pedestrian Safety Fund; and requiring the Secretary of Transportation, in administering the Fund, to prioritize enhancing the safety and quality of pedestrian and bicycle transportation near schools and school bus stops.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0815
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Violations Involving Pedestrians or Bicyclists - Penalties (Pedestrian Safety Act of 2020)
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/13/2020 3/13/2020 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/12/2020 3:55 PM