Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Local AIDS Prevention Sterile Needle and Syringe Exchange Programs
Sponsored by
Delegates Lam, Carr, Ebersole, Fraser-Hidalgo, Glenn, Haynes, Hettleman, Hill, Jalisi, A. Miller, Moon, Morales, Morhaim, Platt, Reznik, B. Robinson, Rosenberg, Smith, Tarlau, Turner, M. Washington, and K. Young
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing a requirement that an AIDS Prevention Sterile Needle and Exchange Program may only be established in the Prince George's County Health Department; authorizing the establishment of an AIDS Prevention Sterile Needle and Syringe Exchange Program by specified entities in any jurisdiction; repealing a requirement that the Program provide for the exchange of used hypodermic needles and syringes on a one-for-one basis; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2015
Legislative Date
2/17/2015
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/23/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/17/2015 2/17/2015 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/20/2015 3/23/2015 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   24-901 through 24-906, 24-907, 24-908, 24-909 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM