Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Garrett County Commissioners - Marijuana Facilities - Location
Sponsored by
Delegate Beitzel
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Authorizing the County Commissioners of Garrett County to enact a local law and adopt regulations relating to the location of any marijuana facility in Garrett County.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0787
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2017
Legislative Date
2/06/2017
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Garrett County Commissioners - Marijuana Facilities - Location
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2017
Legislative Date
2/15/2017
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2017
Legislative Date
2/22/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2017
Legislative Date
2/28/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2017 2/06/2017 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Garrett County Commissioners - Marijuana Facilities - Location
House 2/15/2017 2/15/2017 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/22/2017 2/22/2017 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 2/28/2017 2/28/2017 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM