Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law - Subsequent Election Absentee Ballot List
Sponsored by
Delegates Kramer, Arora, Barkley, Carr, Frick, Guzzone, Kaiser, Luedtke, Rudolph, and Simmons
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Board of Elections to establish guidelines for a subsequent election absentee ballot list; requiring that a voter who receives an absentee ballot be provided the opportunity to request an absentee ballot for the next subsequent election in the written materials accompanying the absentee ballot; requiring that a voter who requests an absentee ballot for the next subsequent election be placed on the subsequent election absentee ballot list for specified elections; etc.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0657 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2013
Legislative Date
2/26/2013
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2013
Legislative Date
3/25/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
Special Order until later today (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/22/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (108-29)
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2013
Legislative Date
3/22/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2013
Legislative Date
3/26/2013
Action
Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2013 2/08/2013 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/13/2013 2/13/2013 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/20/2013 2/20/2013 Hearing cancelled
House 2/26/2013 2/26/2013 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/23/2013 3/25/2013 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 Special Order until later today (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted 54
House 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 54
House 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 Second Reading Passed 54
House 3/25/2013 3/22/2013 Third Reading Passed (108-29) 55
Senate 3/26/2013 3/22/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 53
Senate 3/26/2013 3/26/2013 Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-102, 3-501, 3-504, 9-303, 9-304, 9-305, 9-305.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM