Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Serious and Subsequent Offenders - Conditions for Reinstatement of Driver's License
Sponsored by
Delegates Dumais and Kramer
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Motor Vehicle Administration to revoke or refuse to issue or renew a license or privilege to drive for specified serious offenders; establishing conditions for reinstatement of a driver's license or privilege to drive for specified serious offenders; altering the periods of time that specified subsequent offenders are required to be participants in the Ignition Interlock System Program; and increasing specified penalties for specified prohibited acts concerning ignition interlock systems.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/11/2016
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2016 2/10/2016 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/11/2016 2/11/2016 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/14/2016 3/14/2016 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   16-205.3, 16-404.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM