Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Mental Health and Substance Use Disorder Benefits - Parity
Sponsored by
Delegates Haynes, Bromwell, Cullison, Glenn, Hill, Lam, Morhaim, Oaks, Reznik, Turner, and K. Young
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that specified provisions of law apply to mental health and substance use disorder benefits provided by the Maryland Medical Assistance Program or administered by an administrative services organization; requiring the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene to use the standards used to determine compliance with the federal Mental Health Parity and Addiction Equity Act in determining compliance with a specified provision of law; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0430
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/03/2015 4/06/2015 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-802 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM