Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Highway Administration Neighbor Notification Act
Sponsored by
Delegates Wilkins, Korman, Ebersole, Gibson, Hixson, C. Howard, Kaiser, Sophocleus, Turner, M. Washington, and P. Young
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Highway Administration to send a certain notice to nearby property owners at least 2 weeks in advance of planned construction on a State highway; requiring the Administration to send the notice on behalf of certain persons involved in the planned construction; requiring the notice to include certain information; requiring the Administration to send another notice to nearby property owners if planned construction is postponed under certain circumstances; etc.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1374 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Highway Administration Neighbor Notification Act
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2018
Legislative Date
2/06/2018
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - State Highway Administration Neighbor Notification Act
House 2/06/2018 2/06/2018 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-101, 8-662 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM