Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Abortions - Detection of Fetal Heartbeat (Keep Our Hearts Beating Act)
Sponsored by
Delegates Grammer, Adams, Arentz, Arikan, Boteler, Chisholm, Clark, Cox, Ghrist, Hornberger, Howard, Impallaria, Jacobs, Krebs, Malone, Mangione, Mautz, McComas, Metzgar, Miller, Otto, Parrott, Reilly, Rose, Saab, and Shoemaker
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Prohibiting a physician, except under certain circumstances, from performing or inducing an abortion on a pregnant woman before determining whether the fetus has a detectable heartbeat and if the physician determines that the fetus has a detectable heartbeat; requiring a physician to use a certain method for detecting a fetal heartbeat under certain circumstances; requiring a physician to include certain information in a woman's medical record under certain circumstances; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1008
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Abortions - Detection of Fetal Heartbeat (Keep Our Hearts Beating Act)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2019
Legislative Date
2/19/2019
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2019
Legislative Date
2/20/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2019
Legislative Date
2/25/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Abortions - Detection of Fetal Heartbeat (Keep Our Hearts Beating Act)
House 2/19/2019 2/19/2019 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/20/2019 2/20/2019 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 2/25/2019 2/25/2019 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM