Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Redeemable Beverage Container and Litter Reduction Program
Sponsored by
Delegates Frush, Lafferty, and Morhaim
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Maryland Redeemable Beverage Container and Litter Reduction Program; stating the purpose of the Program; establishing the Maryland Beverage Recycling Organization; establishing the structure and purpose of the Organization; specifying the membership of the Organization; establishing a Board of Directors for the Organization; specifying the composition of the Board; specifying the election, duration of term, and term limits of members of the Board; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0684
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation and Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2015
Legislative Date
2/17/2015
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Environment and Transportation and Economic Matters
House 2/17/2015 2/17/2015 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-1733 through 9-1743 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM