Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers and Dealers
Sponsored by
Delegates Fraser-Hidalgo, Barkley, Beidle, Flanagan, Lam, McCray, Stein, Szeliga, and Waldstreicher
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a motor vehicle dealer to disclose to a consumer the terms and conditions of any motor vehicle manufacturer warranty adjustment program of which the dealer has knowledge and to make any necessary repairs under the adjustment program; prohibiting a manufacturer from retaliating against specified persons because the persons exercise specified rights or assert specified protections, and making a violation an unfair or deceptive trade practice subject to specified penalty and enforcement provisions; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0666
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
Reassigned to Environment and Transportation and Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2016
Legislative Date
2/16/2016
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2016 2/10/2016 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 Reassigned to Environment and Transportation and Economic Matters
House 2/16/2016 2/16/2016 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
House 3/25/2016 3/28/2016 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-1402, 14-14A-01 through 14-14A-03 )
(   15-207, 15-212, 15-212.1, 15-213 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM