Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Open Meetings Act - Retention of Minutes and Recordings - Revision
Sponsored by
Delegates Saab, Cullison, Grammer, Kelly, Kittleman, Krebs, Metzgar, Miele, W. Miller, Morgan, Pena-Melnyk, Rose, Shoemaker, and West
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 330
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing, from 1 year to 5 years, the number of years after the date of an open session a public body is required to keep a copy of specified minutes of the open session and any recording made under specified provisions of law; requiring specified public bodies to post online specified minutes or recordings to the extent practicable; altering a specified requirement relating to the preparation of minutes; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0017
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/09/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/09/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2016
Legislative Date
3/11/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
43A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/10/2016
Legislative Date
5/10/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 330
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2016 2/10/2016 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/17/2016 2/17/2016 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/03/2016 3/08/2016 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/09/2016 3/09/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 41
House 3/09/2016 3/09/2016 Second Reading Passed 41
House 3/14/2016 3/11/2016 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 43A
Senate 3/15/2016 3/15/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 44
Senate 4/04/2016 4/05/2016 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/06/2016 3/31/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 60
Senate 4/06/2016 3/31/2016 Second Reading Passed 60
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 61A
House 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Returned Passed 64
Post Passage 5/10/2016 5/10/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 330
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM