Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Developmental Disabilities Administration - Crisis Resolution and Crisis Prevention Services - Funding and Reporting
Sponsored by
Delegates Cullison, Angel, Barron, Chang, Gaines, Gilchrist, Hayes, Haynes, Healey, Hill, Jackson, Kelly, Krimm, R. Lewis, Morales, Pena-Melnyk, Platt, Queen, Robinson, Sophocleus, Valentino-Smith, M. Washington, and P. Young
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a specified report on the Waiting List Equity Fund to include information regarding individuals in the crisis resolution category of the waiting list for developmental disabilities services; establishing mandated appropriations for developmental disabilities community services; declaring the intent of the General Assembly that an individual, after receiving services provided with specified funds, continue to receive uninterrupted developmental disabilities services in accordance with the individual's needs; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0475
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1499 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations and Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2017
Legislative Date
2/15/2017
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Hearing canceled (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 First Reading Health and Government Operations and Appropriations
Text - First - Developmental Disabilities Administration - Crisis Resolution and Crisis Prevention Services - Funding and Reporting
House 2/15/2017 2/15/2017 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
House 3/14/2017 3/14/2017 Hearing canceled (Health and Government Operations)
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-101, 7-205, 7-205.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM