Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - YWCA Domestic Violence Safe House
Sponsored by
Delegates Beidle, Love, and McMillan
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Authorizing the creation of a State Debt not to exceed $350,000, the proceeds to be used as a grant to the Board of Directors of The Young Women's Christian Association of Annapolis and Anne Arundel County, Inc. for specified development or improvement purposes related to The YWCA Domestic Violence Safe House, located in Anne Arundel County; providing for disbursement of the loan proceeds, subject to a requirement that the grantee provide and expend a matching fund; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0951
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/06/2014
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2014
Legislative Date
2/24/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2014 2/06/2014 First Reading Appropriations
House 2/21/2014 2/24/2014 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM