Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environment - Ambient Air Quality Control - Cumulative Air Impact Analysis
Sponsored by
Delegates Lam, Angel, Barron, Beidle, Carr, Fennell, Fraser-Hidalgo, Gilchrist, Gutierrez, Hill, Korman, Lafferty, Lierman, Moon, Morales, Morhaim, Pena-Melnyk, S. Robinson, Smith, Tarlau, A. Washington, M. Washington, and K. Young
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting the Department of the Environment from issuing a specified air quality permit until specified requirements have been met; prohibiting the Department from recommending specified licensing conditions until specified requirements have been met; requiring the Department to conduct a Cumulative Air Impact Analysis under specified circumstances in accordance with specified requirements; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0693
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/13/2015 2/13/2015 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/31/2015 4/01/2015 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-1301 through 2-1306 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM