Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Security Lapses - Notice to Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund
Sponsored by
Delegates Brooks, Atterbeary, Aumann, D. Barnes, Branch, Bromwell, Ebersole, Fennell, Glenn, Hettleman, C. Howard, Jackson, Jalisi, Jones, Kramer, Lafferty, Lam, J. Lewis, Lierman, Lisanti, Morhaim, Patterson, Pena-Melnyk, Queen, Sample-Hughes, Sanchez, Sydnor, Turner, Valderrama, Wilkins, and P. Young
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Motor Vehicle Administration to notify the Executive Director of the Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund of the final termination or other lapse of security for a vehicle; and requiring the Administration to include in the notice the name and available contact information for the owner of the vehicle.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2018
Legislative Date
2/06/2018
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Security Lapses - Notice to Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund
House 2/06/2018 2/06/2018 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   17-106 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM