Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Procurement - Prevailing Wage Rate Law - Penalties and Liquidated Damages
Sponsored by
Delegate Frick
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing the penalty for specified violations of the prevailing wage rate law related to the posting of specified statements of prevailing wage rates; increasing the amount of liquidated damages for which a contractor is liable for specified violations of the prevailing wage rate law related to specified payroll records; and altering the amount of liquidated damages for which a contractor is liable when specified laborers or other employees are paid less than specified prevailing wage rates.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0833
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/13/2015 2/13/2015 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/19/2015 3/20/2015 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   17-219, 17-220, 17-222 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM