Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
2020 Census Grant Program - Establishment and Funding
Sponsored by
Delegates Gaines, McIntosh, Jones, and Lierman
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the 2020 Census Grant Program to issue matching grants to local governments and nonprofit organizations to support the accurate counting of the population of the State and its local jurisdictions and the collection of basic demographic and housing information; establishing the 2020 Census Grant Program Panel; authorizing a local government or nonprofit organization to apply to the Grant Panel for certain matching funds on or before March 1, 2019; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0855
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - 2020 Census Grant Program - Establishment and Funding
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - 2020 Census Grant Program - Establishment and Funding
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM