Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Civil Actions - Liability of Disability Insurer - Failure to Act in Good Faith
Sponsored by
Delegate Morhaim
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 729
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the recovery of actual damages, expenses, litigation costs, and interest in first-party claims against disability insurers in specified civil actions that allege that the insurer failed to act in good faith under specified circumstances; requiring the Maryland Insurance Administration to include in a specified annual report to the General Assembly specified information on specified complaints regarding first-party insurance claims under individual disability insurance policies; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Judicial Proceedings  
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {562015/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (115-18)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Finance
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/11/2016
Action
No recommendation by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Motion to place bill on Second Reading (Senator Zirkin) Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (40-6)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
70
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/31/2016
Legislative Date
5/28/2016
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 729
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2016 2/10/2016 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/17/2016 3/18/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/18/2016 3/16/2016 Favorable with Amendments {562015/1 Report Adopted 48
House 3/18/2016 3/16/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
House 3/19/2016 3/17/2016 Third Reading Passed (115-18) 49
Senate 3/21/2016 3/19/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Finance 48A
Senate 3/23/2016 3/23/2016 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Senate 4/11/2016 4/11/2016 No recommendation by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/11/2016 4/04/2016 Motion to place bill on Second Reading (Senator Zirkin) Adopted 64
Senate 4/11/2016 4/04/2016 Second Reading Passed 64
Senate 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Third Reading Passed (40-6) 65
House 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Returned Passed 70
Post Passage 5/31/2016 5/28/2016 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 729
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   27-1001 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM