Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Interest Rate on Tax Deficiencies and Refunds
Sponsored by
Delegates Fraser-Hidalgo, Anderton, Davis, Kelly, Kramer, Lafferty, Moon, Otto, S. Robinson, and Szeliga
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Changing the calculation of the interest rate on tax deficiencies and refunds to set the interest rate at 11%; repealing a requirement that the Comptroller annually set the interest rate; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-604 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM