Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Care Malpractice Claims - Health Care Alternative Dispute Resolution Office - Repeal
Sponsored by
Delegate Dumais
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing provisions of law relating to the Health Care Alternative Dispute Resolution Office; terminating the Health Claims Arbitration Fund; requiring the clerk of a court to forward to the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene copies of specified pleadings and certificates of a qualified expert; requiring the Department to forward to the State Board of Physicians copies of specified pleadings and certificates of a qualified expert; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2016 2/10/2016 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/14/2016 3/14/2016 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-920, 3-2A-01, 3-2A-02, 3-2A-03, 3-2A-03A, 3-2A-04, 3-2A-05, 3-2A-06, 3-2A-06A, 3-2A-06B, 3-2A-06C, 3-2A-06D, 3-2A-07, 3-2A-08, 3-2A-08A, 3-2A-09, 3-2A-10 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM