Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Natural Resources - Maryland Environmental Trust - Appointment of Trustees
Sponsored by
Delegate Gilchrist
Status
In the House - Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the manner in which certain trustees are chosen to serve on the board of the Maryland Environmental Trust by requiring certain ex officio members of the Trust to appoint the remaining trustees.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0743
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2021
Legislative Date
2/07/2021
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/08/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/07/2021 2/07/2021 Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Natural Resources - Maryland Environmental Trust - Appointment of Trustees
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/08/2021 3/08/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Last Updated: 3/6/2021 12:56 PM
Click to return on the top page